WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. v. 189.9 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: W1/2SE1/4 Section 14: NW1/4NE1/4 McKenzie County, North Dakota et al

Plaintiff: WBI Energy Transmission, Inc.
Defendant: 189.9 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: W1/2SE1/4 Section 14: NW1/4NE1/4 McKenzie County, North Dakota, 227.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: N1/2SW1/4, W1/2SE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, 242.0 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 2: SW1/4SE1/4 Section 11: NE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, 335.3 rods, more or less, located in Township 150 North, Range 98 W Section 35: W1/2E1/2 McKenzie County, North Dakota, 223.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W, Section 28: S1/2N1/2, McKenzie County, North Dakota, 83.6 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 14: NW1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, Leonard W. Hoffmann, David L. Hoffmann, Denae M. Hoffmann, Margaret A. Hoffmann, Rocky & Jonilla Farms, LLP, Randall D. Stevenson and And all other unknown owners of the above lands
Case Number: 1:2018cv00078
Filed: April 16, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 20, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will initiate the call.(GD)
May 23, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 22 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Named Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Named Defendants shall have until 6/15/2018 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. v. 189.9 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: W1/2SE1/4 Section 14: NW1/4NE1/4 McKenzie County, North Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WBI Energy Transmission, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Casey Ann Furey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 189.9 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: W1/2SE1/4 Section 14: NW1/4NE1/4 McKenzie County, North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 227.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: N1/2SW1/4, W1/2SE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 242.0 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 2: SW1/4SE1/4 Section 11: NE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 335.3 rods, more or less, located in Township 150 North, Range 98 W Section 35: W1/2E1/2 McKenzie County, North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 223.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W, Section 28: S1/2N1/2, McKenzie County, North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 83.6 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 14: NW1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard W. Hoffmann
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Hoffmann
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denae M. Hoffmann
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret A. Hoffmann
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky & Jonilla Farms, LLP
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall D. Stevenson
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And all other unknown owners of the above lands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?