Helgeson et al v. Master Pumps and Equipment Corp.
Plaintiff: Pat Helgeson and Janice Helgeson
Defendant: Master Pumps and Equipment Corp.
Counter_claimant: Master Pumps and Equipment Corp.
Counter_defendant: Janice Helgeson and Pat Helgeson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00122
Filed: June 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Request for Status Conference. Status Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 MOTION to Continue. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 3/6/2020. Parties' Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/3/2020. Parties' Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 2/3/2020. Final Pretrial C onference REset for 4/27/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Jury Trial REset for 5/4/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (3 days). By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (FPT and jury trial previously set for 10/30/2019 and 11/13/2019) (BG)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helgeson et al v. Master Pumps and Equipment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Helgeson
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Helgeson
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Pumps and Equipment Corp.
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Master Pumps and Equipment Corp.
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Janice Helgeson
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pat Helgeson
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?