Foss v. Bakken Oil Express, LLC

Plaintiff: Steven Foss
Defendant: Bakken Oil Express, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00166
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Stark
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days). (BG)
October 2, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
October 2, 2018 9 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 8/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 8/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/1/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 11/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2019, except amendments re punitive damages due by 9/1/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 6/1/2019. Threshold Motions due by 6/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/4/2019.(BG)
October 2, 2018 8 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 10/2/2018. (BG)
August 29, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 10, 2018 6 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring case to Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
August 10, 2018 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Steven Foss. (rh)
August 9, 2018 4 NOTICE by Bakken Oil Express, LLC to State Court and Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal dated 8/2/18)(Flom, Joel)
August 6, 2018 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Steven Foss. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/20/2018. (cjs)
August 6, 2018 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bakken Oil Express, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/20/2018. (cjs)
August 6, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bakken Oil Express, LLC from Stark County District Court. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 118001322. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Answer)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foss v. Bakken Oil Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakken Oil Express, LLC
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Represented By: Zachary C. Burmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Foss
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?