Lawrence v. North Dakota, State of
Petitioner: Robert Ray Lawrence
Respondent: North Dakota, State of
Case Number: 1:2018cv00173
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 MEMORANDUM in Support. Clerks office added exhibit numbers to docket text. (js)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Section 2254 Petition filed by North Dakota, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Register of Actions, State v. Lawrence, Case No. 08-98-K-03060, #2 Exhibit 2 - Criminal Information Case No. 08-98-K-03060, #3 Exhibit 3 - Criminal Judgment, Case No. 08-98-K-03060, #4 Exhibit 4 - Register of Actions, State v. Lawrence, Case No. 08-99-K-01028, #5 Exhibit 5 - Criminal Information, Case No. 08-99-K-01028, #6 Exhibit 6 - Criminal Judgment, Case No. 08-99-K-01028, #7 Exhibit 7 - ND Supreme Court Docket, State v. Lawrence, Supreme Court No. 20000052, #8 Exhibit 8 - ND Supreme Court Docket, State v. Lawrence, Supreme Court No. 20000053, #9 Exhibit 9 - State v. Lawrence, 2000 ND 202, 620 N.W.2d 136, #10 Exhibit 10 - Register of Actions, Lawrence v. State, Burleigh County District Court Case No. 08-2014-CV-00664, #11 Exhibit 11 - Order, Case No. 08 2014 CV 00664, #12 Exhibit 12 - Register of Actions, Lawrence v. State, Burleigh County District Court Case No. 08-2015-CV-00148, #13 Exhibit 13 - Order Denying the Application for Post-Conviction Relief, Lawrence v. State, Case No. 08-2015-CV-00148)(Mahoney, Michael) Modified on 9/10/2018 to add exhibit numbers to docket text. (js)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Section 2254 Petition by North Dakota, State of. (Mahoney, Michael)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Robert Ray Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD) Distributed on 8/22/2018 (cjs).
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (GD) Distributed on 8/22/2018 (cjs).
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Robert Ray Lawrence. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/27/2018. (rh)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Robert Ray Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. North Dakota, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Ray Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: North Dakota, State of
Represented By: Michael T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?