Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.
Defendant: Andra J. Miller, Quality Services Unlimited, Inc., Joy A. Mastel and Allan S. Mastel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00176
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support re #56 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Andra J. Miller. (Traynor, Daniel)
October 18, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Andra J. Miller. (Traynor, Daniel)
October 18, 2018 Filing 55 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint, by Andra J. Miller.(Traynor, Daniel)
October 17, 2018 Filing 54 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Andra J. Miller (as)
October 16, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney by Daniel M. Traynor on behalf of Andra J. Miller (Attachments: #1 Service Document)(Traynor, Daniel)
October 12, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #52 Motion for Default Judgment. Corrected motion relief from Default Judgment to Motion for Entry of Default. (lh)
October 9, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Entry of Default against Andra J. Miller by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Zappia, #2 Certificate of Service)(Zappia, Andrew) Modified on 10/12/2018 to correct motion relief (lh).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting #50 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. as to Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel, and Quality Services Unlimited, Inc. (NH)
September 13, 2018 Filing 50 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel and Quality Services Unlimited, Inc. by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. (Zappia, Andrew)
September 12, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Zappia on behalf of Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. (Zappia, Andrew)
August 23, 2018 Filing 48 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:18-cv-00463. Transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #40 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction: GRANTED IN PART as to improper venue under Rule 12(b)(3) and DENIED AS MOOT as to lack of personal jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(1) and the doctrine of forum non conveniens under Rule 12(b)(3). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), the Clerk shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Bismarck Division. All other pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk shall CLOSE THIS CASE Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 8/21/2018. (MAA)
July 13, 2018 ***Deadlines terminated. (RMF)
July 13, 2018 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #40 Motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction filed by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Katzenberger)(Cole, Andrew)
July 6, 2018 Set deadlines as to #40 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and improper venue. Responses due by 7/13/2018 (JP)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file its response to #40 Defendant Andra J. Miller's motion to dismiss by July 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/6/2018. (DWG)
June 29, 2018 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/13/18 to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and improper venue from July 6, 2018 through July 13, 2018 by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 7/2/2018 (RMF).
June 25, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on March 27, 2019, 10:00 a.m. before Michelle Jernigan. (Cole, Andrew)
June 22, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #37 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Andra J. Miller. (Guerra, Richard) Modified on 6/25/2018 (RMF).
June 22, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of pendency of related cases #37 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Andra J. Miller. Related case(s): yes (North Star Mutual Ins. Co. v. Andra J. Miller, et al. in District Court, County of Morton, State of North Dakota) (Guerra, Richard) Modified on 6/25/2018 (RMF).
June 22, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and improper venue by Andra J. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andra J. Miller)(Guerra, Richard)
June 12, 2018 Filing 39 CASE REFERRED to Mediation, Michelle Jernigan appointed as Mediator. (RMF)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 7/20/2018, Discovery due by 9/30/2019, Dispositive motions due by 10/25/2019, Pretrial statement due by 2/14/2020, All other motions due by 8/30/2019, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/28/2019, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/30/2019, Jury Trial set for 4/1/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 A before Judge Anne C. Conway., Conduct mediation hearing by 10/18/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 6/12/2018. (RMF)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RELATED CASE ORDER,INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing.(DEFENDANT ANDRA J. MILLER) Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/22/2018, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/22/2018. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 6/12/2018. (RMF)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Defendant Andra J. Miller's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Andra J. Miller shall file a response to #22 Plaintiff's amended complaint by June 22, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/11/2018. (DWG)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #29 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission. Attorney Andrew P. Zappia, Esq. shall comply with the instructions stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/11/2018. (DWG)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to strike #33 Notice of Serving Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/11/2018. (DWG)
June 7, 2018 Filing 33 (STRICKEN PER ORDER #34 )NOTICE by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. of Serving Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to Defendants (Braunstein, Alex) Modified on 6/12/2018 (RMF).
June 6, 2018 Filing 32 Second Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time up to and until June 22, 2018, to File Answer re #22 Amended Complaint by Andra J. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guerra, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 6/7/2018 (JP).
June 5, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Andrew Zappia, appearing on behalf of Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL074166.) Related document: #29 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew P. Zappia to appear pro hac vice. (JP)
June 4, 2018 Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Cole, Andrew)
June 1, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. re #29 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew P. Zappia to appear pro hac vice Notice regarding payment of $150 special admission fee (Braunstein, Alex)
June 1, 2018 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew P. Zappia to appear pro hac vice by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. (Braunstein, Alex) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 31, 2018 Set deadline: for Andra J. Miller. Answer due by 6/8/2018. (ALL)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Defendant Andra J. Miller's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By June 8, 2018, Andra J. Miller shall file a response to #22 Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/31/2018. (DWG)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Joint Request to Permit Telephonic Case Management Conference provided that the parties agree on the essentials of the case management report. Otherwise, the parties shall appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/30/2018. (DWG)
May 30, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #22 Amended Complaint by Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel, Quality Services Unlimited, Inc..(Gegan, Edmund)
May 30, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Louis Braunstein on behalf of Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. (Braunstein, Alex)
May 30, 2018 *** #24 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically in Lieu of in Person Conference Due to Geographic Distance of Counsel REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (CB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 30, 2018 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically in Lieu of in Person Conference Due to Geographic Distance of Counsel by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Andrew)
May 29, 2018 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #22 Amended Complaint by Andra J. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guerra, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 23, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Corrected - substituting labeled exhibit) against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. Related document: #21 Amended Complaint filed by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cole, Andrew)
May 22, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel, Andra J. Miller, Quality Services Unlimited, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cole, Andrew)
May 21, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel, Quality Services Unlimited, Inc.. (Gegan, Edmund)
May 21, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel, Quality Services Unlimited, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Gegan, Edmund) Modified on 5/22/2018 (RMF).
May 15, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel, Quality Services Unlimited, Inc. (Gegan, Edmund) Modified on 5/16/2018 (RMF).
May 14, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel.(Gegan, Edmund)
May 11, 2018 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 04/18/2018 by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. as to Andra J. Miller. (Cole, Andrew)
May 9, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #8 Notice to counsel of Local Rule filed by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. (Cole, Andrew)
May 1, 2018 reset deadline: Answer due 5/14/18 for Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel. (RMF)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Complaint. Allan S. Mastel and Joy A. Mastel's answer or response to #1 Plaintiff's complaint is due on May 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/1/2018. (DWG)
April 30, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/15/18 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel. (Gegan, Edmund) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 5/1/2018 (RMF).
April 18, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. (Cole, Andrew)
April 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel (Gegan, Edmund)
April 2, 2018 ***Deadlines terminated. (RMF)
April 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Cole, Andrew)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/16/2018, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/16/2018. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/2/2018. (RMF)
March 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 for attorney Alex L. Braunstein (signed by deputy clerk).(Copy mailed to attorney). (RMF)
March 28, 2018 Filing 7 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint part 1, #2 Complaint part 2) (RMF)
March 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Quality Services Unlimited, Inc. (RMF)
March 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Joy A. Mastel. (RMF)
March 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Allan S. Mastel. (RMF)
March 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Andra J. Miller. (RMF)
March 27, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE disclosure statement by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. (RMF)
March 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allan S. Mastel, Joy A. Mastel, Andra J. Miller, Quality Services Unlimited, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL 072236) filed by Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(RMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maid to Perfection Global, Inc. v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andra J. Miller
Represented By: Daniel M. Traynor
Represented By: David A. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Services Unlimited, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy A. Mastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan S. Mastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maid to Perfection Global, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Zappia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?