Wall v. Joseph A. Vogel, Jr. and Jan R. Vogel Irrevocable Trust et al

Plaintiff: Mavis A. Wall
Defendant: Thomas J. Ingalls, Matthew E. Ingalls and Joseph A. Vogel, Jr. and Jan R. Vogel Irrevocable Trust
Case Number: 1:2018cv00178
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to Counterclaim #24 by Mavis A. Wall.(Manly, Robert)
October 19, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #30 Answer to Counterclaim. Clerk's office added description to attachment. (lh)
October 18, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to Counterclaim #17 by Mavis A. Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Quit Claim Deed 12/13/04)(Manly, Robert) Modified on 10/19/2018 to add description to attachment (lh).
October 15, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (7 days). (BG)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 7/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 7/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/1/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 3/1/2019. Threshold Motions due by 3/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2019. (BG)
October 15, 2018 Filing 26 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2018. (BG)
October 11, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand Response to Defendant Thomas J. Ingalls' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by Mavis A. Wall. (Manly, Robert)
October 9, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Modified entry to correct answer due date; #20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Modified entry to reflect correct filer, Matthew E. Ingalls, and corrected answer due date. (js)
October 5, 2018 Filing 24 Matthew E. Ingalls ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against Mavis A. Wall by Matthew E. Ingalls. (Andrews, Michael)
October 4, 2018 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Shawn A. Grinolds re #22 Response to Motion by Thomas J. Ingalls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence from Robert Manley to Peter Zuger dated July 20, 2018, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence from Robert Manley to Shawn Grinolds recieved on August 16, 2018)(Bakke, Randall)
October 4, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Thomas J. Ingalls. (Bakke, Randall)
October 3, 2018 Answer Deadlines Terminated. Thomas J. Ingalls ANSWER filed on 9/28/2018; Matthew E. Ingalls ANSWER filed on 10/5/2018. (js)
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Matthew E. Ingalls. (Andrews, Michael)
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Matthew E. Ingalls. Matthew E. Ingalls served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Grinolds, Shawn) Modified on 10/9/2018 to correct filer and answer due date. (js)
October 3, 2018 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Thomas J. Ingalls. Thomas J. Ingalls served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (Grinolds, Shawn) Modified on 10/9/2018 to correct answer due date. (js)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will initiate the call.(GD) Modified on 10/11/2018 to correct hearing type; NEF regenerated (lh).
September 28, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Mavis A. Wall by Thomas J. Ingalls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trust, #2 Exhibit B - Quit Claim Deed dated Octoberr 30, 1992, #3 Exhibit C - First Amendment to Trust Agreement dated April 25, 1995, #4 Exhibit D - Order Approving Trust Amendment No. 1 dated May 18, 1995, #5 Exhibit E - Quit Claim Deed, #6 Exhibit F - Interim Agreement)(Grinolds, Shawn) Modified on 10/1/2018 to add docket text (cjs).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER adopitng #11 Stipulation For Extension of Response Deadline. Defendant Matthew E. Ingalls shall have until 10/5/2018 file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 20, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #14 Motion for Remand. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access and re-filed as Memorandum in Support at #15 . (rh)
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Mavis A. Wall. (rh)
September 20, 2018 Filing 14 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand by Mavis A. Wall. (Manly, Robert) Modified on 9/20/2018 to restrict access to document. (rh)
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Mavis A. Wall. (Manly, Robert)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hauff on behalf of Matthew E. Ingalls (Hauff, David)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION For Extension of Response Deadline by Matthew E. Ingalls. (Andrews, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER adopting #9 Stipulation For Extension of Response Deadline. Defendant Thomas J. Ingalls shall have until 9/28/2018 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION For Extension of Response Deadline by Thomas J. Ingalls. (Grinolds, Shawn)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Matthew E. Ingalls. (rh)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr., as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Thomas J. Ingalls. (cjs)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Andrews on behalf of Matthew E. Ingalls (Andrews, Michael)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Ingalls re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental (Grinolds, Shawn)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Mavis A. Wall. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/13/2018. (cjs)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Thomas J. Ingalls. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/13/2018. (cjs)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Thomas J. Ingalls from Morton County District Court, case number None assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 118001415 filed by Thomas J. Ingalls. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. Joseph A. Vogel, Jr. and Jan R. Vogel Irrevocable Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Ingalls
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew E. Ingalls
Represented By: Michael T. Andrews
Represented By: David J. Hauff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Vogel, Jr. and Jan R. Vogel Irrevocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mavis A. Wall
Represented By: Robert G. Manly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?