Continental Resources, Inc. v. Fisher et al

Plaintiff: Continental Resources, Inc.
Defendant: Rick Fisher and Rosella Fisher
Case Number: 1:2018cv00181
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2018 20 ANSWER to Counterclaim #5 by Continental Resources, Inc..(Bender, Lawrence)
October 15, 2018 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial (5 days) set for 1/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (GD)
October 15, 2018 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2020 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.(GD)
October 15, 2018 17 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 5/5/2019. Discovery Motions due by 5/5/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/1/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 6/15/2019. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 5/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/3/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2018. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 12/3/2018. Threshold Motions due by 12/3/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019.(GD)
October 15, 2018 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2018. (GD)
October 3, 2018 15 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Rosella Fisher. (cjs)
October 3, 2018 14 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Rick Fisher. (cjs)
September 28, 2018 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Rosella Fisher. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/12/2018. (as)
September 28, 2018 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Rick Fisher. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/12/2018. (as)
September 26, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul R. Taylor. (GD) Regenerated NEF to Attorney Taylor on 9/27/2018 (am).
September 26, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley S. Keller. (GD) Regenerated NEF to Attorney Keller on 9/27/2018 (am).
September 26, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller J.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
September 25, 2018 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul R. Taylor (Filing fee $150, receipt number 118001519) by Continental Resources, Inc.. (am)
September 25, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bradley S. Keller (Filing fee $150, receipt number 118001519) by Continental Resources, Inc.. (am)
September 25, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rick Fisher, Rosella Fisher re #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Wenko, Christina)
September 25, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Continental Resources, Inc. by Rosella Fisher, Rick Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ND Supreme Court Opinion, #2 Exhibit ND Supreme Court Judgment)(Wenko, Christina)
September 21, 2018 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Continental Resources, Inc. (rh)
September 7, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Rick Fisher, Rosella Fisher. (am)
September 7, 2018 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Continental Resources, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/21/2018. (am)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Rick Fisher, Rosella Fisher (Filing fee $400, receipt number 118001452) filed by Continental Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer and Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order of Dismissal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(am) (Attachment 2 and 3 replaced on 9/17/2018 to remove double header.) (as).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Resources, Inc. v. Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Bradley S. Keller
Represented By: Paul R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Fisher
Represented By: Christina M. Wenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosella Fisher
Represented By: Christina M. Wenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?