Anderson v. Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD.

Plaintiff: Darius Anderson
Defendant: Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00192
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelly Jines. (am)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kelly Jines (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000225) by Darius Anderson. (Jines, Kelly) Modified on 11/20/2018 to add receipt number (am).
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will initiate the call. (GD)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryce M. Miller on behalf of Darius Anderson (Tierney, Patrick) Modified on 11/19/2018 to correct notice to reflect appearance by Attorney Miller. Regenerated NEF (cjs).
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD..(Oster, Amy)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD shall have until 11/16/2018 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. (BG)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD. identifying Corporate Parent Steel Partners Holdings L.P., Other Affiliate Steel Energy Services Ltd., Other Affiliate Steel Excel, Inc., Other Affiliate SPH Group Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate SPH Group LLC, Other Affiliate Steel Partners Holdings GP, Inc. for Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD... (Sand, Benjamin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD.. (Sand, Benjamin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Sand on behalf of Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD. (Sand, Benjamin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy M. Oster on behalf of Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD. (Oster, Amy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darius Anderson. Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD. served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018 (Tierney, Patrick)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD.. (am)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 118001521) filed by Darius Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hawk Energy Services, LTD.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Amy M. Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Anderson
Represented By: Patrick T. Tierney
Represented By: Kelly Jines
Represented By: Bryce Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?