Berkley National Insurance Company v. XTO Energy, Inc.

Plaintiff: Berkley National Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: XTO Energy, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Torus National Insurance Company, Seneca Specialty Insurance Company and Commerce and Industry Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00195
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 18 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiffs answer to XTO's counterclaim due by 12/12/2018. (BG)
November 20, 2018 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Berkley National Insurance Company. (Wright, Thomas)
November 13, 2018 16 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ernest Martin. (as)
November 13, 2018 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000059) by XTO Energy, Inc. (Martin, Ernest) Modified on 11/13/2018 to add receipt number. (as)
November 13, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 ANSWER/THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT/COUNTERCLAIM. Third-Party Complaint adds parties. Clerk's office added parties and corrected docket entry text. DOCKET CORRECTION re: #14 ANSWER to Counterclaim. Clerk's office added descriptions to attachments and replaced attachments 1, 2, 3, and 4 to remove the double header. (as)
November 13, 2018 14 ANSWER to Counterclaim #7 by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Service of Process, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Daniel and Ana Pavon's Motion to Intervene, #4 Exhibit D - Justin Pyle's Motion to Intervene, #5 Exhibit E - Master Service Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Master Service Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Energy Commercial General Liability Declarations, #8 Exhibit H - Energy Commercial Umbrella Liability Declarations, #9 Exhibit I - Forms Schedule, #10 Exhibit J - Montana Policy Changes, #11 Exhibit K - Commercial Umbrella Liability Insurance Policy)(Thorne, Leslie) Modified on 11/13/2018 to add descriptions to exhibits. (as) (Attachment 1, 2, 3, and 4 replaced on 11/13/2018 to remove double headers) (as)
November 13, 2018 13 Summons Issued as to Third Party Defendants Commerce and Industry Insurance Company, Seneca Specialty Insurance Company, Torus National Insurance Company. (as)
November 13, 2018 12 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 12/10/2018 is cancelled. It shall be rescheduled at a later date and time. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
November 8, 2018 11 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carla Green. (am)
November 8, 2018 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Carla Green (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000182) by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Green, Carla) Modified on 11/8/2018 to add receipt number (am).
November 8, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 7, 2018 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XTO Energy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Exxon Mobil Corporation for XTO Energy, Inc... (Thorne, Leslie)
November 7, 2018 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Commerce and Industry Insurance Company, Torus National Insurance Company and Seneca Specialty Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Berkley National Insurance Company by XTO Energy, Inc..(Thorne, Leslie) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correct third-party defendants. (as)
November 1, 2018 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkley National Insurance Company. (Wolf, Troy)
October 22, 2018 5 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until 11/07/2018 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. (BG)
October 19, 2018 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thorne, Leslie)
October 17, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Berkley National Insurance Company. XTO Energy, Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018 (Wolf, Troy)
October 1, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to XTO Energy, Inc.. (am)
September 28, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against XTO Energy, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 11900003) filed by Berkley National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley National Insurance Company v. XTO Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: XTO Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Carla Green
Represented By: Ernest Martin, Jr
Represented By: Leslie C. Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley National Insurance Company
Represented By: Troy A. Wolf
Represented By: Thomas C. Wright
Represented By: Susan A. Daigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Torus National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Seneca Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Commerce and Industry Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?