De Jesus Harber v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Maria De Jesus Harber
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv00201
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Social Security Administration answer due 1/25/2019. (am)
December 4, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration served on 11/23/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Wicklund, Edward)
November 28, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Burkland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Burkland, Melissa)
November 27, 2018 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (cjs)
October 19, 2018 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Maria De Jesus Harber. (rh)
October 11, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (am)
October 11, 2018 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Maria De Jesus Harber. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/25/2018. (am)
October 11, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward A. Wicklund. (BG) NEF regenerated to PHV attorney on 10/11/2018 (am).
October 10, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward A. Wicklund (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000047) by Maria De Jesus Harber. (am)
October 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000046) filed by Maria De Jesus Harber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(am) Regenerated on 10/12/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Jesus Harber v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Jesus Harber
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?