Postelmans v. Williston, City of et al
Plaintiff: Renate Evangeline Postelmans
Defendant: Williston, City of, Williams County States Attorney, Oren Amund Vallevik, Whispers, Inc. and Williston Police Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv00214
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Renate Evangeline Postelmans. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(am)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Renate Evangeline Postelmans. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/20/2018. (am) Distributed on 11/13/2018 (am).
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Oren Amund Vallevik, Whispers, Inc., Williams County States Attorney, Williston Police Department, Williston, City of (IFP Granted) filed by Renate Evangeline Postelmans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (GD) Distributed on 10/26/2018 (cjs).
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Renate Evangeline Postelmans. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/7/2018. (am) Distributed on 10/24/2018 (am).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Renate Evangeline Postelmans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Mailing Envelope, #4 Mailing Envelope)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Postelmans v. Williston, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williston, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams County States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oren Amund Vallevik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whispers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williston Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renate Evangeline Postelmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?