Spirit Lake Tribe et al v. Jaeger

Plaintiff: Clark Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Leslie Peltier, Terry Yellow Fat, Kara Longie, Kim Twinn and Dion Jackson
Defendant: Alvin Jaeger
Case Number: 1:2018cv00222
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2018 37 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER adopting #36 Stipulation. Defendant shall have until 1/07/2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 13, 2018 36 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #28 Waiver of Service Executed by Alvin Jaeger. (Sagsveen, Matthew)
November 2, 2018 35 Featured Case ORDER Adopting #34 Stipulation by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(RLB)
November 2, 2018 34 STIPULATION Regarding Individual Plaintiffs' Eligibility to Vote in November 2018 General Election by Alvin Jaeger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Longie Letter Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Jackson Letter Redacted, #3 Exhibit C - Yellow Fat Letter Redacted)(Sagsveen, Matthew) Modified on 11/5/2018 to add exhibit letters. (rh)
November 1, 2018 33 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying #8 Motion for TRO. (MM)
November 1, 2018 32 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Danielle M. Lang. (am)
November 1, 2018 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Danielle M. Lang (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000139) by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Lang, Danielle) Modified on 11/1/2018 to add receipt number (am).
November 1, 2018 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Rebecca Titus on behalf of Alvin Jaeger (Titus, Courtney)
October 31, 2018 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Sagsveen on behalf of Alvin Jaeger (Sagsveen, Matthew)
October 31, 2018 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Kara Longie, Terry Yellow Fat, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Dion Jackson. Alvin Jaeger waiver sent on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 27 AFFIDAVIT of Phyllis Young re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 26 AFFIDAVIT of Terry Yellow Fat re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 25 AFFIDAVIT of Vice-Chairman Douglas Yankton re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 24 AFFIDAVIT of Kim Twinn re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 23 AFFIDAVIT of Lonna Jackson Street re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 22 AFFIDAVIT of Robin Smith re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 21 AFFIDAVIT of Adriana Riggs with exhibits 1 and 2 re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy) Modified on 11/5/2018 to note docket text of exhibit numbers. (js)
October 31, 2018 20 AFFIDAVIT Joint Affidavit of Leslie and Clark ("Kono") Peltier with exhibit 1 re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy) Modified on 11/5/2018 to note docket text of exhibit numbers. (js)
October 31, 2018 19 AFFIDAVIT Second Affidavit of Moshe Pasternak re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 18 AFFIDAVIT of Moshe Pasternak with exhibits FB-1 through FB-20 and exhibits SL-1 through SL-20 re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy) Modified on 11/5/2018 to note docket text of exhibit numbers. (js)
October 31, 2018 17 AFFIDAVIT of Kara Longie re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 16 AFFIDAVIT of Marcus N. Laverdure, Sr. re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 15 AFFIDAVIT of James K. Laducer re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 14 AFFIDAVIT of Dion Jackson re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 13 AFFIDAVIT of Sara Hesse re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 12 AFFIDAVIT of Molly E. Danahy with exhibits 1 through 14 re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy) Modified on 11/5/2018 to note docket text of exhibit numbers. (js)
October 31, 2018 11 AFFIDAVIT of Margaret Christ with exhibits FB-1 through FB-28 re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy) Modified on 11/5/2018 to note docket text of exhibit numbers. (js)
October 31, 2018 10 AFFIDAVIT of Ace Charette re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Purdon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 7 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Molly Danahy; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark P. Graber. (cjs)
October 31, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Danahy), #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Graber). Clerk's office restricted access to documents and re-filed in non-fillable pdf format at #5 and #6 . (cjs)
October 31, 2018 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark P. Gaber (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000132) by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (cjs)
October 31, 2018 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Molly Danahy (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000131) by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (cjs)
October 31, 2018 4 *RESTRICTED-ERROR IN DOCUMENT* MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark P. Gaber (Filing fee $150, receipt number) by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Gaber, Mark) Modified on 10/31/2018 to restrict access (cjs).
October 31, 2018 3 *RESTRICTED-ERROR IN DOCUMENT* MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number) by Dion Jackson, Kara Longie, Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Terry Yellow Fat. (Danahy, Molly) Modified on 10/31/2018 to restrict access (cjs).
October 30, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Alvin Jaeger. (rh)
October 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Alvin Jaeger (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000127) filed by Clark Peltier, Leslie Peltier, Kara Longie, Terry Yellow Fat, Spirit Lake Tribe, Kim Twinn, Dion Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spirit Lake Tribe et al v. Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Peltier
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Matthew Lee Campbell
Represented By: Jacqueline D. De Leon
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Molly Danahy
Represented By: Mark Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit Lake Tribe
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Matthew Lee Campbell
Represented By: Jacqueline D. De Leon
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Molly Danahy
Represented By: Mark Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Peltier
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Matthew Lee Campbell
Represented By: Jacqueline D. De Leon
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Molly Danahy
Represented By: Mark Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Yellow Fat
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Matthew Lee Campbell
Represented By: Jacqueline D. De Leon
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Molly Danahy
Represented By: Mark Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Longie
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Matthew Lee Campbell
Represented By: Jacqueline D. De Leon
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Molly Danahy
Represented By: Mark Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Twinn
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Matthew Lee Campbell
Represented By: Jacqueline D. De Leon
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Molly Danahy
Represented By: Mark Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion Jackson
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Matthew Lee Campbell
Represented By: Jacqueline D. De Leon
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Molly Danahy
Represented By: Mark Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Jaeger
Represented By: Courtney Rebecca Titus
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?