KLX Energy Services LLC v. Telos Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: KLX Energy Services LLC
Defendant: Telos Industries, Inc. and Dustin Adams
Case Number: 1:2018cv00225
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 1/11/2019 (cjs)
December 20, 2018 20 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation re #19 Stipulation, filed by KLX Energy Services LLC by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (GD)
December 19, 2018 19 STIPULATION to Extend Plaintiff's Deadlines to File Responses to Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Inventorship Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(1) by KLX Energy Services LLC. (Presthus, Courtney)
December 17, 2018 18 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
December 17, 2018 17 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Dustin Adams, Telos Industries, Inc. (rh)
December 17, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Ashmore on behalf of KLX Energy Services LLC (Presthus, Courtney) Modified on 12/19/2018 to correct attorney name. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
December 17, 2018 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dustin Adams, Telos Industries, Inc.. (Bender, Lawrence)
December 17, 2018 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dustin Adams, Telos Industries, Inc.. (Bender, Lawrence)
December 14, 2018 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dustin Adams, Telos Industries, Inc.. (Bender, Lawrence)
December 14, 2018 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dustin Adams, Telos Industries, Inc.. (Bender, Lawrence)
December 14, 2018 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by KLX Energy Services LLC. (cjs)
December 3, 2018 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Telos Industries, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/17/2018. (lh)
December 3, 2018 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dustin Adams. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/17/2018. (lh)
November 30, 2018 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Dustin Adams, Telos Industries, Inc.. (Bender, Lawrence)
November 30, 2018 7 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until 12/14/2018 to file answers or to otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. (BG)
November 30, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Dustin Adams, Telos Industries, Inc.. (Bender, Lawrence)
November 13, 2018 5 Summons Returned Executed filed by KLX Energy Services LLC. Telos Industries, Inc. served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 11/19/2018 to correct docket text. (as).
November 13, 2018 4 Summons Returned Executed filed by KLX Energy Services LLC. Dustin Adams served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 11/19/2018 to correct docket text. (as)
November 2, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Dustin Adams, Telos Industries, Inc.. (cjs)
November 2, 2018 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to KLX Energy Services LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/16/2018. (cjs)
November 2, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Dustin Adams, Telos Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000144) filed by KLX Energy Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proprietary Rights Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Letter dated June 22, 2017, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Dustin Adams, #4 Exhibit D-Letter dated October 27, 2017, #5 Exhibit E-Defendants' response to 12/20/2017 letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLX Energy Services LLC v. Telos Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telos Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Bryan Haynes
Represented By: Tommy Chase Garrett
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Represented By: Christian Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Adams
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Bryan Haynes
Represented By: Tommy Chase Garrett
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Represented By: Christian Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KLX Energy Services LLC
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Represented By: Courtney A. Presthus
Represented By: Alison Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?