Tosseth v. Remington Arms Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christina Tosseth
Defendant: Beretta U.S.A. Corp. and Remington Arms Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00230
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Natalie J. Eschbach. (cjs)
December 17, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (10 days). (BG)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 9/20/2019. Discovery Motions due by 10/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/26/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/30/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 10/25/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2019, except amendments re punitive damages due by 5/31/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 9/13/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/13/2019. (BG)
December 17, 2018 Filing 19 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 12/17/2018. (BG)
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Natalie J. Eschbach (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000352) by Remington Arms Company, LLC. (Eschbach, Natalie) (Main Document 18 replaced on 12/17/2018 in a non-fillable pdf format) (cjs). Modified on 12/17/2018 to add receipt number. Regenerated NEF (cjs).
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew A. Lothson. (am)
December 13, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew A. Lothson (Filing fee $150, receipt number #119000338) by Remington Arms Company, LLC. (Lothson, Andrew) Modified on 12/13/2018 to add receipt number (am).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig A. Livingston. (am)
December 5, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Craig A. Livingston (Filing fee $150, receipt number #119000294) by Beretta U.S.A. Corp.. (Livingston, Craig) Modified on 12/6/2018 to add receipt number (am).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 21, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerk's office modified corporate parent information. (rh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Remington Arms Company, LLC identifying Other Affiliate FGI Operating Company, LLC, Other Affiliate FGI Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Remington Outdoor Company, Inc. for Remington Arms Company, LLC.. (Hoy, Robert) Modified on 11/21/2018 to correct corporate parent information. (rh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Remington Arms Company, LLC. (Hoy, Robert)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Christina Tosseth. (rh)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Remington Arms Company, LLC. (rh)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Beretta U.S.A. Corp. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/30/2018. (rh)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beretta U.S.A. Corp.. (Boschee, Larry)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Beretta U.S.A. Corp..(Boschee, Larry)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Remington Arms Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Affidavit of Andrew A. Lothson, and Civil Cover Sheet (Hoy, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Christina Tosseth. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/27/2018. (rh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Remington Arms Company, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/27/2018. (rh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Remington Arms Company, LLC from Burleigh Co. District Court, case number 08-2018-cv-2944. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000201. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Consent from Beretta U.S.A. Corp. for removal, #3 Affidavit of Andrew A. Lothson, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tosseth v. Remington Arms Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beretta U.S.A. Corp.
Represented By: Craig A. Livingston
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company, LLC
Represented By: Robert G. Hoy
Represented By: Andrew A. Lothson
Represented By: Natalie Eschbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Tosseth
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?