Wilansky v. Morton County, North Dakota et al
Plaintiff: Sophia Wilansky
Defendant: Morton County, North Dakota, Kyle Kirchmeier, John Doe, Thomas Iverson and Paul Laney
Case Number: 1:2018cv00236
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: the #24 MOTION for Discovery is administratively termed. The court shall set a scheduling conference at a date and time to be determined. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Discovery Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling/Discovery Plan by Sophia Wilansky. (Stoll, Benjamin)
November 28, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Wilansky. Paul Laney served on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019 (Stoll, Benjamin)
November 28, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Sagsveen on behalf of Thomas Iverson (Sagsveen, Matthew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Nicolai on behalf of Thomas Iverson (Nicolai, James)
November 27, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Wilansky. Thomas Iverson served on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/22/2019 (Stoll, Benjamin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Wilansky. Morton County, North Dakota served on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/22/2019 (Stoll, Benjamin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Wilansky. Kyle Kirchmeier served on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019 (Stoll, Benjamin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 17 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Sophia Wilansky. (cjs)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr., as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Kyle Kirchmeier, Paul Laney, Morton County, North Dakota. (cjs)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #8 Motion to Seal Document (Exhibit 1 to Complaint). (GD)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Defendants' answer due 1/22/2019. (GD)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Morton County, North Dakota. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/5/2018. (rh)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Paul Laney. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/5/2018. (rh)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kyle Kirchmeier. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/5/2018. (rh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 1 to Complaint filed by Kyle Kirchmeier, Paul Laney, Morton County, North Dakota. (Bakke, Randall)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 1 to Complaint by Kyle Kirchmeier, Paul Laney, Morton County, North Dakota. (Bakke, Randall)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kyle Kirchmeier, Paul Laney, Morton County, North Dakota. (Bakke, Randall)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Kyle Kirchmeier, Paul Laney, Morton County, North Dakota. (Bakke, Randall)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kyle Kirchmeier, Paul Laney, Morton County, North Dakota. (Bakke, Randall)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall J. Bakke on behalf of Kyle Kirchmeier, Paul Laney, Morton County, North Dakota (Bakke, Randall)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Sophia Wilansky. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/3/2018. (rh)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe, Thomas Iverson, Kyle Kirchmeier, Paul Laney, Morton County, North Dakota. (rh)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Thomas Iverson, Kyle Kirchmeier, Paul Laney, Morton County, North Dakota (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000224) filed by Sophia Wilansky. (Attachments: #1 *SEALED* Exhibit 1 - Photo of Injury, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) Modified on 11/21/2018 to seal Exhibit 1 per Order at #14 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilansky v. Morton County, North Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Wilansky
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Stoll
Represented By: Edward C. Barnidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton County, North Dakota
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Kirchmeier
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Iverson
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Represented By: James E. Nicolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Laney
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?