United States of America v. Fleming et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Procollect Services, LLC, Mary B. Fleming, Hospital Services, Inc. and Mary Fleming
Case Number: 1:2018cv00239
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mary B. Fleming served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Process Receipt and Return)(js)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Hospital Services, Inc. served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018; Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018; Procollect Services, LLC served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018 (Iversen, Tara)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mary B. Fleming, Hospital Services, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Procollect Services, LLC. (cjs)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary B. Fleming, Hospital Services, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Procollect Services, LLC (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Itemized Statement of Account, #4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Mailing, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Fleming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procollect Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tara V. Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?