Kinnard et al v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Plaintiff: Elaine C. Kinnard and Stephanie L. Fay
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00243
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 1/7/2019. (GD) Modified on 1/8/2019 to note that minutes are text only. NEF regenerated (lf).
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. Jury Trial (2 days) set for 6/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (GD)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 12/5/2019. Discovery Motions due by 12/5/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/5/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/21/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 11/11/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/5/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/18/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 1/6/2020. Threshold Motions due by 7/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2020.(GD) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/7/2019 to correct caption) (am). Regenerated on 1/7/2019 (am).
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER:Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hess Corporation for Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC.. (Forster, Paul)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC from Williams Co. District Court, case number 53-2018-cv-1757. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000231. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Williams Co. Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Williams Co. Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Oil & Gas Lease, #4 Exhibit 4 - Memorandum of Oil & Gas Lease, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to Fay and Kinnard, #6 Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Service, #7 Exhibit 7 - Return Receipt for Service, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notification of Assignment and Case Number, #9 Exhibit 9 - Williams Co. Notice of Appearance (Forster & Eiken), #10 Exhibit 10 - Certificate of Service, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Certificate of Service, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinnard et al v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine C. Kinnard
Represented By: Charles M. Carvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie L. Fay
Represented By: Charles M. Carvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?