Lacey v. Nabors Completion & Production Services et al
Plaintiff: Kelvin Lacey
Defendant: Nabors Completion & Production Services and C&J Spec-Rent Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00244
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, (Status Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Nabors Completion & Production Services. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/31/2019. (rh)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to C&J Spec-Rent Services, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/31/2019. (rh)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Notice to Court of Bankruptcy Discharge by C&J Spec-Rent Services, Inc., Nabors Completion & Production Services.(Oster, Amy)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Kelvin Lacey. (cjs)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kelvin Lacey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/3/2019. (rh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kelvin Lacey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/17/2018. (am)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to C&J Spec-Rent Services, Inc., Nabors Completion & Production Services. (am)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan Beaman. (am)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Megan Beaman (Filing fee $150, receipt number #119000264) by Kelvin Lacey. (Beaman, Megan) Modified on 12/3/2018 to add receipt number (am).
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C&J Spec-Rent Services, Inc., Nabors Completion & Production Services (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000232) filed by Kelvin Lacey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) NEF regenerated on 12/3/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacey v. Nabors Completion & Production Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabors Completion & Production Services
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Amy M. Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&J Spec-Rent Services, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Amy M. Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Lacey
Represented By: Megan Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?