Eberline Oilfield Service, Inc. v. Eberline et al
Plaintiff: Eberline Oilfield Service, Inc.
Defendant: All in One Oil Field Service, Inc. and Chad Eberline
Case Number: 1:2018cv00245
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 MOTION and #8 MEMORANDUM in Support. Clerk's office added filer All in One Oil Flied Services, Inc. (as)
January 21, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Chad Eberline and All in One Field Service, Inc. (Ward, John) Modified on 1/23/2019 to add filer. (as)
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Chad Eberline and All in One Oil Field Service, Inc. (Ward, John) Modified on 1/23/2019 to add filer. (as)
December 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: All in One Oil Field Service, Inc. answer due 1/21/2019; Chad Eberline answer due 1/21/2019. (cjs)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation re #5 Stipulation filed by All in One Oil Field Service, Inc., Chad Eberline by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
December 20, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Stipulation. Clerk's office added filer (All in One Oil Field Service, Inc.). (rh)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION ForExtension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Chad Eberline, All in One Oil Field Service, Inc. (Ward, John) Modified on 12/20/2018 to add filer (All in One Oil Field Service, Inc.) (rh)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eberline Oilfield Service, Inc.. Chad Eberline served on 12/1/2018, answer due 12/24/2018 (Hagel, Justin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eberline Oilfield Service, Inc.. All in One Oil Field Service, Inc. served on 12/1/2018, answer due 12/24/2018 (Hagel, Justin)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All in One Oil Field Service, Inc., Chad Eberline. (rh)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All in One Oil Field Service, Inc., Chad Eberline (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000239) filed by Eberline Oilfield Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eberline Oilfield Service, Inc. v. Eberline et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All in One Oil Field Service, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa Lovas
Represented By: John E. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Eberline
Represented By: Alyssa Lovas
Represented By: John E. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eberline Oilfield Service, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Hagel
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?