Hein v. Okland Construction Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rachel Hein
Defendant: Okland Construction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00248
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 6/1/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (7 days). (BG)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 10/15/2019. Discovery Motions due by 10/15/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/1/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 9/2/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 9/16/2019. Threshold Motions due by 3/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2020. (BG)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 12/27/2018. (BG)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2018 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Okland Construction Company, Inc.. (Bronczyk, Corey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Rachel Hein. (rh)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr., as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Okland Construction Company, Inc.. (cjs)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Okland Construction Company, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/13/2018. (rh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Rachel Hein. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/13/2018. (rh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Okland Construction Company, Inc. from Mountrail Co. District Court, case number Unknown. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000257. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mountrail Co. Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Extension to Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hein v. Okland Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Hein
Represented By: David D. Schweigert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okland Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Bronczyk
Represented By: Jonathon M Zentner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?