Pedie v. North Star Community Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Vicktoria Pedie
Defendant: Trans Union LLC and North Star Community Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2018cv00252
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by North Star Community Credit Union.(Sayler, Jason)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr., as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Trans Union LLC. (cjs)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union LLC.(Brady, Scott)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Vicktoria Pedie. (rh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Vicktoria Pedie. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/3/2019. (rh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Trans Union LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/3/2019. (lh)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC.. (Brady, Scott)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Brady on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Brady, Scott)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Vicktoria Pedie. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/17/2018. (am)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to North Star Community Credit Union, Trans Union LLC. (am)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North Star Community Credit Union, Trans Union LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000276) filed by Vicktoria Pedie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedie v. North Star Community Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicktoria Pedie
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Community Credit Union
Represented By: Jason Paul Sayler
Represented By: Daniel M. Traynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?