Bridges v. Bertsch
Petitioner: John C. Bridges and Almighty God Satan
Respondent: USA and Leann Bertsch
Case Number: 1:2018cv00266
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (kmk) Distributed on 2/8/2019. (rh)
February 1, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Leann Bertsch. (rh)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Leann Bertsch. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/15/2019. (rh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Leann Bertsch re #19 Supplement (Mahoney, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT to document: #15 MOTION to Dismiss 2254 Petition by Leann Bertsch. (Mahoney, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by John C. Bridges. (rh) Distributed to ND Attorney General on 1/11/2019. (rh)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #14 Motion to Amend Habeas Petition. (BG) Distributed to Petitioner and ND Attorney General on 1/11/2019. (rh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss 2254 Petition filed by Leann Bertsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Register of Actions, State v. Bridges, Burleigh County District Court Case No. 08 2013-CR-02276, #2 Exhibit 2 - Criminal Information, State v. Bridges, Burleigh County District Court Case No. 08 2013-CR-02276, #3 Exhibit 3 - Criminal Judgment, State v. Bridges, Burleigh County District Court Case No. 08 2013-CR-02276)(Mahoney, Michael) Modified on 1/11/2019 to add exhibit numbers (am).
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss 2254 Petition by Leann Bertsch. (Mahoney, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by John C. Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by John C. Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from John C. Bridges (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (cjs)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SUBSTITUTING NAMED RESPONDENT AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER PETITION by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed to Petitioner and ND Attorney General on 12/28/2018. (rh)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed on 12/28/2018. (rh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to John C. Bridges. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/31/2018. (rm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Colorado, Case Number 1:18-cv-02816. Original file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL IN PART AND TO TRANSFER CASE. That the clerk of the court transfer the claim challenging the validity of Mr. Bridges' 2013 state court conviction to the United States District Court for the District of North Dakota. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any civil rights claim asserted in the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMSISED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for improper venue. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Transfer Habeas Action (ECF No. #5 ), filed on November 13, 2018, and the Motion & Cause to Transfer Habeas Action (ECF No. #6 ), filed on November 19, 2018, are granted in part and denied in part, as set forth above. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 is DENIED as moot, By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/13/2018. (evana, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION & Cause to Transfer Habeas Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) and 1631 by Petitioner John C. Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Envelope) (athom, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Habeas Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) and 1631 (w/Cause) by Petitioner John C. Bridges. (athom, )
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Mr. Bridges show cause in writing, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to invoke this Court's federal habeas corpus jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 2241. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this action will be dismissed without further notice if Mr. Bridges fails to show cause as directed within the time allowed., by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/5/2018. (evana, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John C. Bridges. (dbera, ) Modified on 12/17/2018 to correct text. (rm)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) filed by John C. Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dbera, ) Modified on 12/17/2018 to change event from complaint to Motion. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridges v. Bertsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leann Bertsch
Represented By: Michael T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John C. Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Almighty God Satan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?