Halcon Operating Co., Inc. v. Rez Rock N Water, LLC

Petitioner: Halcon Operating Co., Inc.
Respondent: Rez Rock N Water, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00007
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Certificate of Service. Clerk's office added link. (cjs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: #8 Notice (Other) by Halcon Operating Co., Inc. (Forster, Paul) Modified on 2/14/2019 to add link(cjs).
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Halcon Operating Co., Inc. of Entry of Order and Judgment (Forster, Paul)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT.(rh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Halcon Operating Co., Inc. Affidavit of Mailing (Forster, Paul)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(RLB)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Halcon Operating Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Halcon Resources Corporation for Halcon Operating Co., Inc... (Forster, Paul)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rez Rock N Water, LLC. (cjs)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF WALTER MAYER re #1 Application to Confirm Arbitration Award by Halcon Operating Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit B-Master Service Contract)(cjs)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against Rez Rock N Water, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000127) filed by Halcon Operating Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halcon Operating Co., Inc. v. Rez Rock N Water, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Halcon Operating Co., Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Joshua Brent Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rez Rock N Water, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?