Hassan v. North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Plaintiff: Beanka Hassan
Defendant: North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case, as referral judge. (kmk)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beanka Hassan. North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation waiver sent on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Thomas, Shea)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Rebecca Titus on behalf of North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (Titus, Courtney)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(am)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Beanka Hassan. (am)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Beanka Hassan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/24/2019. (rh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (rh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000435) filed by Beanka Hassan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassan v. North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Courtney Rebecca Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beanka Hassan
Represented By: Shea Ashley Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?