Mayne v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Steven Mayne
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00019
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Steven Mayne. (am)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Steven Mayne. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/8/2019. (cjs)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (cjs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Burkland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Burkland, Melissa)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cjs)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Steven Mayne. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/6/2019. (cjs)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000476) filed by Steven Mayne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayne v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Mayne
Represented By: Paul A. Temanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?