Alston et al v. EOG Resources, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Alston and Ernest Alston
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc. and Rebecca Imes
Case Number: 1:2019cv00034
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EOG Resources, Inc., Rebecca Imes re #4 Answer to Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint (Harrie, William)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Answer and Demand for Jury Trial of Rebecca Imes by Rebecca Imes.(Harrie, William)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Answer and Demand for Jury Trial of EOG Resources, Inc. by EOG Resources, Inc..(Harrie, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernest Alston, Pamela Alston. EOG Resources, Inc. served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019 (Maring, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to EOG Resources, Inc., Rebecca Imes. (am)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EOG Resources, Inc., Rebecca Imes (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000564) filed by Ernest Alston, Pamela Alston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston et al v. EOG Resources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Represented By: William P. Harrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Imes
Represented By: William P. Harrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Alston
Represented By: David S. Maring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Alston
Represented By: David S. Maring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?