Black Island Resources, LLP v. Newfield Production Company

Plaintiff: Black Island Resources, LLP
Defendant: Newfield Production Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00035
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
0 Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
1 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 9/6/2019. Discovery Motions due by 9/6/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/4/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 12/6/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/26/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/26/2019, except amendments re punitive damages due by 10/4/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 4/26/2019. Threshold Motions due by 4/26/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/4/2019.(BG)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 14 replaced on 3/6/2019 with corrected email addresses; NEF regenerated) (lh). (Main Document 14 replaced on 3/7/2019 to correct date in order) (am). NEF regenerated on 3/7/2019 (am).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. The court shall initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (3 days). (BG)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2019. (BG)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Newfield Production Company. (rh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Counterclaim #6 by Black Island Resources, LLP.(Johnson, Ariston)
February 20, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Answer to Counterclaim. Wrong document attached. Clerk's office restricted access to document per filer's request. (rh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED* ANSWER to Counterclaim #6 by Black Island Resources, LLP.(Johnson, Ariston) Modified on 2/20/2019 to restrict access per filer's request. (rh)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.) by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Chambers will initiate the call.(GD) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/20/2019 to correct judge's e-mail address. Regenerated NEF.) (rh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Newfield Production Company. (Bender, Lawrence)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Black Island Resources, LLP. (rh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Newfield Production Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/27/2019. (cjs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Black Island Resources, LLP. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/27/2019. (cjs)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Newfield Production Company from McKenzie County District Court, case number 27-2019-CV-00076. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 119000569 filed by Newfield Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Notice of Filing Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit D-Certificate of Service, #6 Affidavit of Eric Clark, #7 Exhibit 1-Division Order)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Island Resources, LLP v. Newfield Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Island Resources, LLP
Represented By: Ariston Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newfield Production Company
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?