Rink Construction, Inc. v. Mid-Continent Casualty Co.

Plaintiff: Rink Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Mid-Continent Casualty Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00036
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be GrantedMOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) filed by Mid-Continent Casualty Co.. (Ward, John)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shannon M. Awsumb. (am)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000695) by Rink Construction, Inc.. (Awsumb, Shannon) Modified on 3/15/2019 to add receipt number (am).
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be GrantedMOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) filed by Rink Construction, Inc.. (Rowell, Kristin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be GrantedMOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) filed by Mid-Continent Casualty Co.. (Ward, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) by Mid-Continent Casualty Co.. (Ward, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mid-Continent Casualty Co. from District Court of McKenzie County, case number 27-2019-CV-00051. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 119000579 filed by Mid-Continent Casualty Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rink Construction, Inc. v. Mid-Continent Casualty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rink Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin Rowell
Represented By: Shannon M. Awsumb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Continent Casualty Co.
Represented By: John E. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?