Young v. Burleigh Morton Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Laron Young
Defendant: Dave W. Hangsleben, Mike Hangsleben, Reliance Telephone Inc. and Burleigh Morton Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv00039
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dave W. Hangsleben, Mike Hangsleben, Reliance Telephone Inc..(Beehler, Bradley)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reliance Telephone Inc.. (Beehler, Bradley)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mike Hangsleben, Reliance Telephone Inc., Dave W. Hangsleben. Mike Hangsleben waiver sent on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019; Reliance Telephone Inc. waiver sent on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019; Dave W. Hangsleben waiver sent on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Beehler, Bradley)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh) Distributed on 3/26/2019. (rh)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Laron Young. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Laron Young. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/1/2019. (rh)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Notice of Direct Assignment. Mail resent to Laron Young at HACTC (USM confirmed he is being held at HACTC). (cjs)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Burleigh Morton Detention Center, Dave W. Hangsleben, Mike Hangsleben, Reliance Telephone Inc. filed by Laron Young.(rh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to Heart of America Correctional and Treatment Center and Laron Young re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (rh)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed to Heart of America Correctional and Treatment Center and Laron Young on 3/7/2019 (rh).
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Laron Young. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/19/2019. (rh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Notices of Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Service of a Summons, #2 Mailing Envelopes)(rh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laron Young. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(rh)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Burleigh Morton Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave W. Hangsleben
Represented By: Bradley J. Beehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hangsleben
Represented By: Bradley J. Beehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Telephone Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J. Beehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burleigh Morton Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laron Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?