Storm v. North Range Resources, LLC

Plaintiff: Shannon K. Storm
Defendant: North Range Resources, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00040
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Shannon K. Storm. (Ficek, Vince)
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph J. Barile re #17 Response to Motion by North Range Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - IRS Letter)(Huckfeldt, Christina)
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand filed by North Range Resources, LLC. (Huckfeldt, Christina)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter as presiding judge for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. Parties consented to the Magistrate Judge in their scheduling plan.(as)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 9/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Trial Est. 4 Days). (AS)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Chambers will initiate the call. (AS)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Discovery Motions due by 12/20/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/4/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/24/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 8/28/2019. Threshold Motions due by 9/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2020. (AS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 3/29/2019. (lc)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 3/29/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Previously set before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.) (BG) Modified on 3/28/2019 to add previously set language. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
March 27, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Affidavit. Wrong event selected. Document should have been filed as an attachment to #7 Affidavit. Clerk's office restricted access to the document and added the document to entry #7 . (rh) Modified on 3/28/2019 to correct docket numbers. NEF Regenerated. (as)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED - SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS AN ATTACHMENT TO AFFIDAVIT* AFFIDAVIT Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Vince H. Ficek in Support of Motion to Remand dated March 25, 2019 re #7 Affidavit by Shannon K. Storm. (Ficek, Vince) Modified on 3/27/2019 to restrict access to document. (rh)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Vince H. Ficek in Support of Motion to Remand re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand, #6 MEMORANDUM in Support by Shannon K. Storm. (Ficek, Vince) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2019: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10/2/18 Letter from Lawrence Bender to Vince H. Ficek) (rh).
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Shannon K. Storm. (Ficek, Vince)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand by Shannon K. Storm. (Ficek, Vince)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/5/2019 to correct email in order. NEF regenerated and distributed on 3/5/2019 (am).
March 5, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Answer. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) at #3 . (cjs)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by North Range Resources, LLC. (cjs)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ANSWER to Complaint by North Range Resources, LLC.(Bender, Lawrence) Modified on 3/5/2019 to restrict access(cjs).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North Range Resources, LLC from McKenzie County District Court, case number 27-2019-CV-00084. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 119000611 filed by North Range Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C-Certificate of Service)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storm v. North Range Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon K. Storm
Represented By: Vince H. Ficek
Represented By: Vince H Ficek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Range Resources, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?