United States Department of Labor v. JMAC Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States Department of Labor
Defendant: JMAC Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00047
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ringel on behalf of JMAC Resources, Inc. (Ringel, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Department of Labor. JMAC Resources, Inc. waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Finnigan, Matthew)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by United States Department of Labor. (rh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to United States Department of Labor. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/1/2019. (rh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to United States Department of Labor. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/20/2019. (cjs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JMAC Resources, Inc.. (cjs)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JMAC Resources, Inc. (U.S. Government as Plaintiff, no filing fee required) filed by United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Department of Labor v. JMAC Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Matthew Finnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMAC Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?