Foglesong v. Marquis Metal Works, LLC
Plaintiff: Jeff Foglesong
Defendant: Marquis Metal Works, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00048
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Marquis Metal Works, LLC.(Albrecht, Kristy)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint for Extension of Time to Answer by Marquis Metal Works, LLC. (Thronson, Ashley)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley R. Thronson on behalf of Marquis Metal Works, LLC (Thronson, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeff Foglesong. Marquis Metal Works, LLC served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019 (Moulton, David)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jeff Foglesong of Withdrawal of Consent (Moulton, David)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jeff Foglesong of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent)(Moulton, David) Modified on 3/15/2019 (am).
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jeff Foglesong of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent)(Moulton, David) Modified on 3/13/2019 (cjs).
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Marquis Metal Works, LLC. (rh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marquis Metal Works, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000645) filed by Jeff Foglesong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foglesong v. Marquis Metal Works, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquis Metal Works, LLC
Represented By: Joseph M. Sokolowski
Represented By: Kristy L. Albrecht
Represented By: Ashley R. Thronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Foglesong
Represented By: David I. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?