Knowles v. North Dakota State Penitentiary et al

Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Defendant: Jessica Wilkens, Patti Youngbird, Tracy Schmidt, North Dakota State Penitentiary and Dr. Hellebush
Case Number: 1:2019cv00082
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #7 Notice of Collection of Filing Fee, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail not resent to Efrain Knowles as current address is unknown. (rh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Hellebush, North Dakota State Penitentiary, Tracy Schmidt, Jessica Wilkens, Patti Youngbird filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Grievance Form, #2 Miscellaneous Attachments 1, #3 Miscellaneous Attachments 2, #4 Mailing Envelope)(am)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to NDSP and Efrain Reyes Knowles re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (am)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (GD) Distributed on 6/12/2019 (am).
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/25/2019. (rh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Grievances, #2 Miscellaneous Attachments (Part 1), #3 Miscellaneous Attachments (Part 2), #4 Notices of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons)(rh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (am)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. North Dakota State Penitentiary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Youngbird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hellebush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?