Knowles v. D.O.C.R. et al
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Defendant: D.O.C.R. and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00086
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 JUDGMENT in favor of D.O.C.R., United States of America against Efrain Reyes Knowles by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(cjs) Distributed on 7/9/2019 (cjs).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #11 Report and Recommendations. (kmk) Distributed on 7/9/2019 (cjs).
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 Complaint filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 6/24/2019 (cjs).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned to the case, as presiding judge. (kmk) Distributed on 6/24/2019 (cjs). Modified on 6/24/2019 to correct text (kmk).
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to North Dakota State Penitentiary re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (am) Distributed on 6/20/2019(am).
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against D.O.C.R., United States of America filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments, #2 Mailing Envelopes)(am)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/20/2019 to correct typographical error.) (am). NEF regenerated and distributed on 6/20/2019 (am).
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Inmate Grievances and DOCR Response by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE (Inmate Request to Facility for Certificate of Inmate Accounts) by Efrain Reyes Knowles re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate Certificate of Inmate Accounts, #2 Mailing Envelope). NOTE: Duplicate copy of Certificate received by the Clerk's Office after original certificate received at docket #2 .(js)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/24/2019. (js)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Positive Behavior Reports & Inmate Grievance Reports, #2 Mailing Envelopes)(js)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(js)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. D.O.C.R. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O.C.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?