Chapman v. Bullrock, LLC
Plaintiff: Harley Chapman
Defendant: Bullrock, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00141
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(JS)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Bullrock, LLC. (am)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bullrock, LLC re #9 Answer to Complaint (Smith, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bullrock, LLC.(Smith, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Harley Chapman. (rh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Harley Chapman. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/19/2019. (am)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harley Chapman. Bullrock, LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 (Liles, William)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Harley Chapman. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/8/2019. (cjs)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bullrock, LLC. (cjs)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William R. Liles. (cjs)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney William R. Liles (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119001239) by Harley Chapman. (Liles, William) Modified on 7/25/2019 to add receipt number (cjs). (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/25/2019 in a non-fillable pdf format) (cjs). NEF regenerated on 7/25/2019 (cjs).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bullrock, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001184). (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join Wage Claim, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Bullrock, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley Chapman
Represented By: William R. Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullrock, LLC
Represented By: David J. Smith
Represented By: Tyler J. Malm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?