Fenlon v. Nickelback Transport, Inc.

Plaintiff: Derek Fenlon
Defendant: Nickelback Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00142
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Nickelback Transport, Inc.. (Ward, John)
August 26, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 RESPONSE to Motion. Clerks office added more complete descriptions to attachment A. (js)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Deposit Funds and Rule 56(d) Motion for Continuance filed by Derek Fenlon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Shawn Holdaway)(Welmaker, Douglas) Modified on 8/26/2019 to add exhibit description. (js)
August 6, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Deposit Funds. Extra motion relief filed in error (Motion to Deposit Funds). Clerk's office removed 2nd motion relief and terminated motion. DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 AFFIDAVIT. Clerk's office added link to MOTION to Dismiss at #5 . (as)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Shawn Holdaway in Support of #5 Motion to Dismiss Pltf's Complaint for Failure to state a Claim by Nickelback Transport, Inc. (Pathroff, Dennis) Modified on 8/6/2019 to add link.(as)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nickelback Transport, Inc.. (Pathroff, Dennis) Modified on 8/6/2019 to remove 2nd motion relief. (as)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nickelback Transport, Inc. (Pathroff, Dennis) Modified on 8/6/2019 to remove incorrect second motion relief. (as)
July 15, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 Notice. Clerk's Office added description to attachment. (cjs)
July 12, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 NOTICE. Clerk's office added description to exhibit and removed excess text. (am)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Derek Fenlon of Filing of Consent of Susan Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Susan Miller Consent)(Welmaker, Douglas) Modified on 7/15/2019 to add exhibit description (cjs).
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Derek Fenlon of Notice of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Consent by Jay Ledin)(Welmaker, Douglas) Modified on 7/12/2019 to add description to exhibit and removed excess text (am).
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nickelback Transport, Inc.. (am)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nickelback Transport, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001175) filed by Derek Fenlon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fenlon v. Nickelback Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickelback Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Pathroff
Represented By: Patrick J. Ward
Represented By: John E. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Fenlon
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland
Represented By: Douglas B Welmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?