Weslease 2018 Operating LP v. Behan et al
Plaintiff: Weslease 2018 Operating LP
Defendant: Bull Moose Pipeline LLC, Lindale Pipeline LLC and Dale Behan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00157
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Counterclaim #11 by Weslease 2018 Operating LP.(Grant, Erich)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Counterclaim #7 by Weslease 2018 Operating LP.(Grant, Erich)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION for More Definite StatementMOTION for Administrative Relief re #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 9 MOTION for More Definite StatementMOTION for Administrative Relief filed by Weslease 2018 Operating LP. (Grant, Erich)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION for Administrative Relief re #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Dale Behan. See document at #11 . (am)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Rule 23(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement, Motion for Administrative Relief, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Dale Behan.(Forman, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weslease 2018 Operating LP. (Grant, Erich)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION for Administrative Relief by Bull Moose Pipeline LLC, Lindale Pipeline LLC. See Document #7 . (rh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bull Moose Pipeline LLC, Lindale Pipeline LLC. (Forman, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Rule 12(e) Motion for more Definite Statement, Motion for Administrative Relief, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Lindale Pipeline LLC, Bull Moose Pipeline LLC.(Forman, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Weslease 2018 Operating LP. (rh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Weslease 2018 Operating LP. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/19/2019. (am)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Weslease 2018 Operating LP. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/7/2019. (rh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dale Behan, Bull Moose Pipeline LLC, Lindale Pipeline LLC. (rh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dale Behan, Bull Moose Pipeline LLC, Lindale Pipeline LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001229) filed by Weslease 2018 Operating LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Registration - Weslease 2018 Operating LP, #2 Exhibit 2 - Texas Franchise Tax Report - Lindale Pipeline, LLC, #3 Exhibit 2.1 - Texas Business Inquiry - Lindale Pipeline, LLC, #4 Exhibit 3 - ND Secretary of State Certificate of Good Standing - Lindale Pipeline, LLC, #5 Exhibit 4 - Texas Franchise Tax Report - Bull Moose Pipeline, LLC, #6 Exhibit 5 - Trade Name Search - Weslease, #7 Exhibit 6 - Receivership Order - 7/26/18, #8 Exhibit 7 - Approval and Vesting Order - 11/27/18, #9 Exhibit 8 - Receiver's Certificate - 12/20/18, #10 Exhibit 9 - UCC Financing Statement - Bull Moose Pipeline, LLC, #11 Exhibit 9.1 - UCC Financing Statement - Lindale Pipeline, LLC - 8/10/16, #12 Exhibit 9.2 - UCC Financing Statement - Lindale Pipeline, LLC - 9/27/16, #13 Exhibit 9.3 - UCC Financing Statement - Bull Moose Pipeline, LLC - 8/10/016, #14 Exhibit 9.4 - UCC Financing Statement - Bull Moose Pipeline, LLC - 9/11/18, #15 Exhibit 9.5 - UCC Financing Statement Amendment - Bull Moose Pipeline, LLC, 9/11/18, #16 Exhibit 9.6 - UCC Financing Statement - Bull Moose Pipeline, LLC - 9/27/16, #17 Exhibit 10 - ND UCC - Lindale Pipeline, LLC - 3/15/19, #18 Exhibit 10.1 - ND UCC - Lindale Pipeline, LLC - 3/15/19, #19 Exhibit 10.2 - UCC Financing Statement Amendment - Bull Moose Pipeline, LLC - 3/12/19, #20 Exhibit 10.3 - ND UCC - Bull Moose Pipeline, LLC - 3/15/19, #21 Exhibit 10.4 - ND UCC - Bull Moose Pipeline, LLC - 3/15/19, #22 Exhibit 10.5 - Bull Moose Pipeline, LLC, Williams Co. Lien - 9/13/17, #23 Exhibit 11 - Lease Agreement - Dale Behan, Lindale Pipeline & Bull Moose Pipeline - 6/30/16, #24 Exhibit 12 - Notice of Approval of Lease, #25 Exhibit 13 - 6/30/16 Security Agreement, #26 Exhibit 14 - Acceptance Certificate - 6/30/16, #27 Exhibit 15 - Promissory Note - 6/30/16, #28 Exhibit 16 - Lease Agreement - 6/30/16, #29 Exhibit 16.1 - Lease Agreement - 8/5/16, #30 Exhibit 17 - Notice of Approval of Lease - 6/30/16, #31 Exhibit 17.1 - Rewrite of Approval of Lease - 6/30/16, #32 Exhibit 18 - Security Agreement - 6/30/16, #33 Exhibit 18.1 - Security Agreement - 8/5/16, #34 Exhibit 19 - Acceptance Certificate - 6/30/16, #35 Exhibit 19.1 - Acceptance Certificate - 8/5/16, #36 Exhibit 20 - Promissory Note - 6/30/16, #37 Exhibit 21 - Lease Agreement - 6/30/16, #38 Exhibit 21.1 - Lease Agreement - 8/5/16, #39 Exhibit 22 - Notice of Approval of Lease - 6/30/16, #40 Exhibit 22.1 - Notice of Approval of Lease - 6/30/16, #41 Exhibit 23 - Security Agreement - 6/30/16, #42 Exhibit 23.1 - Security Agreement - 8/5/16, #43 Exhibit 24 - Acceptance Certificate - 6/30/16, #44 Exhibit 24.1 - Acceptance Certificate - 8/5/16, #45 Exhibit 25 - Promissory Note - 3/18/16, #46 Exhibit 25.1 - Promissory Note - 6/30/16, #47 Exhibit 26 - Lease Agreement - 6/30/16, #48 Exhibit 26.1 - Lease Agreement - 8/5/16, #49 Exhibit 27 - Notice of Approval of Lease - 6/30/16, #50 Exhibit 28 - Security Agreement - 6/30/16, #51 Exhibit 29 - Acceptance Certificate - 6/30/16, #52 Exhibit 30 - Promissory Note - 6/30/16, #53 Exhibit 31 - Demand Letter - 3/27/19, #54 Exhibit 32 - Demand Letter - 4/8/19, #55 Exhibit 33 - Emails from Keith Talbot, #56 Exhibit 33.1 - Email to Dale Behan - 4/8/19, #57 Exhibit 33.2 - Email re: Regional Water Assets)(rh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2019: #58 Civil Cover Sheet) (rh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weslease 2018 Operating LP v. Behan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bull Moose Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Michael L. Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindale Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Michael L. Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Behan
Represented By: Michael L. Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weslease 2018 Operating LP
Represented By: Erich M. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?