Sonia v. Performance Transport, LLC
Plaintiff: Matt Sonia
Defendant: Performance Transport, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00163
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Performance Transport, LLC.(Thompson, Seth)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by KrisAnn Norby-Jahner on behalf of Performance Transport, LLC (Norby-Jahner, KrisAnn)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER re #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have until 9/12/2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Performance Transport, LLC. (Thompson, Seth)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matt Sonia. Performance Transport, LLC served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019 (Dunlap, Andrew)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap. (rh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119001268) by Matt Sonia. (Dunlap, Andrew) Modified on 8/1/2019 to add receipt number. (rh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Performance Transport, LLC. (cjs)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Taylor A. Jones. (rh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Taylor A. Jones (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119001267) by Matt Sonia. (Jones, Taylor) Modified on 8/1/2019 to add receipt number. (rh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Performance Transport, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001258) filed by Matt Sonia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Matthew D. Sonia Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs) Regenerated to Attorneys Jones and Dunlap on 8/1/2019 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonia v. Performance Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Sonia
Represented By: Andrew Dunlap
Represented By: Taylor Ashley Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Transport, LLC
Represented By: KrisAnn Norby-Jahner
Represented By: Seth A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?