Quandt v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Kurtis Quandt
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00196
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 10/31/2019. (JS)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (10 days) (JS)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 11/20/2020. Discovery Motions due by 11/20/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/15/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/1/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 3/19/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 9/25/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 12/18/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2021.(JS)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring case to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by BNSF Railway Company. (rh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to BNSF Railway Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/15/2019. (am)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland John Wells, III on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Wells, Roland)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Haws on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Haws, Daniel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for BNSF Railway Company.. (Haws, Daniel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company.(Haws, Daniel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kurtis Quandt. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/7/2019. (pb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kurtis Quandt. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/26/2019. (rh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (rh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001432) filed by Kurtis Quandt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quandt v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Daniel A. Haws
Represented By: Roland John Wells, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurtis Quandt
Represented By: Joseph M. Sayler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?