Knowles v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Defendant: Captain Wicks, United States of America, Joshua and Ryan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00197
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Case terminated for failure to pay filing fee. Documents returned to inmate. (rh)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing plaintiff's complaint without prejudice as to all defendants and all claims. (JS) Distributed on 11/8/2019. (rh)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Efrain Knowles (Attachments: #1 Inmate Inventory Statements, #2 Mailing Envelope) (am)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2019. (BG) Distributed on 9/17/2019. (rh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/27/2019. (rh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA Packet. (rh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Wicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?