Hunter v. City of Minot Police Department
Plaintiff: Michael H. Hunter
Defendant: City of Minot Police Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00204
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED by Michael H. Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Order Declaring Unconstitutional, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Michael Hunter (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (rh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED by Michael H. Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments, #2 Mailing Envelope)(am)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED by Michael H. Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Documents Received, #2 Mailing Envelope, #3 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT by Michael H. Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The matter is dismissed without prejudice. Distributed.(rh)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #4 Report and Recommendations. (kmk) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/15/2019 to correct error. Regenerated NEF. Distributed.) (rh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION by Michael H. Hunter to #4 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to document: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael H. Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A-Words of a Walking Miracle, #3 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael H. Hunter by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG) Distributed on 9/23/2019 (cjs).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned to the case, as presiding judge. (kmk) Distributed on 9/23/2019 (cjs).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Michael H. Hunter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/3/2019. (cjs) Distributed on 9/19/2019 (cjs).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael H. Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Proposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Proposed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. City of Minot Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael H. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Minot Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?