Nichols v. Bertch et al
Plaintiff: Aron Wesley Nichols
Defendant: Shaun Fode, Barb Gross, Colby Braun, Heather Banker, Leann Buertch, James Sayler and Leann Bertch
Case Number: 1:2019cv00234
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barb Gross, Shaun Fode, James Sayler, Colby Braun, Leann Bertch, Heather Banker. Barb Gross waiver sent on 11/5/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; Shaun Fode waiver sent on 11/5/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; James Sayler waiver sent on 11/5/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; Colby Braun waiver sent on 11/5/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; Leann Bertch waiver sent on 11/5/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; Heather Banker waiver sent on 11/5/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service to Plaintiff)(Bialke, Joseph)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (am) Distributed on 11/7/2019 (am).
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Aron Wesley Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(am)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT (Signed Notices of A Lawsuit and Requests to Waive Service of Summons) to document: #9 Request for Waiver of Service by Aron Wesley Nichols. Request for Waiver of Service sent to North Dakota Attorney General's Office on 11/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(am)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to North Dakota Attorney General's Office on 11/5/19. Waiver of Service due by 12/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waivers of Service of Summons)(rh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Heather Banker, Leann Bertch, Colby Braun, Shaun Fode, Barb Gross, James Sayler filed by Aron Wesley Nichols.(rh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to NDSP and Aron Nichols re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (rh)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG) Distributed on 11/5/2019. (rh)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed on 11/5/2019. (rh)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Aron Wesley Nichols. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/13/2019. (am)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Unsigned Notices of A Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #3 Mailing Envelope with Original PLRA Packet, #4 Mailing Envelope for Certificate of Inmate Account)(am)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aron Wesley Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(am)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Bertch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Fode
Represented By: Joseph P. Bialke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barb Gross
Represented By: Joseph P. Bialke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby Braun
Represented By: Joseph P. Bialke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Banker
Represented By: Joseph P. Bialke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leann Buertch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sayler
Represented By: Joseph P. Bialke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leann Bertch
Represented By: Joseph P. Bialke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aron Wesley Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?