GEM Razorback, LLC v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Plaintiff: GEM Razorback, LLC
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00236
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 12/9/2019. (JS)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (3 days) (JS) Modified on 12/9/2019 to add number of days. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Discovery Motions due by 10/16/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/6/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/24/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 11/13/2020. Join Additional Parties due by 6/4/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 12/7/2020. Threshold Motions due by 6/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2020. (JS)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (cjs)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Forster, Paul)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC identifying Other Affiliate Oasis Petroleum LLC, Other Affiliate Oasis Petroleum Inc. for Oasis Petroleum North America LLC.. (Forster, Paul)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by GEM Razorback, LLC. (rh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/8/2019. (cjs)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to GEM Razorback, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/8/2019. (cjs)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC from McKenzie County District Court, case number 27-2019-CV-00425. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120000074 filed by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Summons, #4 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Joshua Swanson, #5 Exhibit D-Oil and Gas Lease, #6 Exhibit E-Email from Carlson to GEM, #7 Exhibit F-Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit G-Notification of Assignment and Case Number, #9 Exhibit H-Demand for Change of Judge, #10 Exhibit I-Certificate of Service, #11 Exhibit J-Reassignment Order, #12 Exhibit K-Notice of Appearance, #13 Exhibit L-Demand for Change of Judge, #14 Exhibit M-Certificate of Service, #15 Exhibit N-Reassignment Order, #16 Exhibit O-Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #17 Exhibit P-Proposed Order, #18 Exhibit Q-Certificate of Service, #19 Exhibit R-Order for Extension of Time, #20 Exhibit S-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #21 Exhibit T-Certificate of Service)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEM Razorback, LLC v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Represented By: John W. Morrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEM Razorback, LLC
Represented By: Matthew W Sorensen
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?