Grindeland v. Continental Resources, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dana Grindeland
Defendant: Mike Larson Consulting, Ltd., Continental Resources, Inc. and Flatirons Resources LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00240
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Flatirons Resources LLC.(Bender, Lawrence)
November 15, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access and re-filed as First Amended Complaint at #4 . (am)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Flatirons Resources LLC, Mike Larson Consulting, Ltd.. (am)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Flatirons Resources LLC, Mike Larson Consulting, Ltd. filed by Dana Grindeland.(am)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mike Larson Consulting, Ltd., Flatirons Resources LLC filed by Dana Grindeland.(am) Modified on 11/15/2019 to restrict access (am).
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Continental Resources, Inc., Mike Larson Consulting, Ltd.. (am)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Continental Resources, Inc., Mike Larson Consulting, Ltd. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000111) filed by Dana Grindeland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grindeland v. Continental Resources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Larson Consulting, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flatirons Resources LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Grindeland
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?