Knowles v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00250
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (am) Distributed on 12/30/2019 (am).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter recused. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 12/30/2019 (am).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case assigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. (cc: Knowles)(as)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(as)
December 3, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case terminated in error. Civil case remains active. (pb)
December 3, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Case terminated for failure to complete PLRA Litigation Packet. Original documents returned to inmate. (pb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/9/2019. (pb) Distributed on 11/25/2019 (pb).
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons)(pb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #2 Mailing Envelope) (pb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #3 Letter (sent in as complaint)) (as).
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(pb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?