Knowles v. Hochhalter et al
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Defendant: Clare R. Hochhalter, Daniel L. Hovland, Matthew A. Sagsveen and David R. Phillips
Case Number: 1:2019cv00251
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Cse assigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (as)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (as)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The matter is dismissed without prejudice. Distributed.(rh)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and adopting #7 Report and Recommendations. (kmk) Distributed on 12/16/2019. (rh)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal recommending the #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles be denied. (Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2019). (AS) Distributed on 11/26/2019 (as)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Distributed.(rh)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter recused. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 11/26/2019. (rh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/9/2019. (pb) Distributed on 11/25/2019 (pb).
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons)(pb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #2 Mailing Envelope) (pb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #3 Letter (sent as original complaint)) (as).
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(pb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. Hochhalter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare R. Hochhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel L. Hovland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?