Short et al v. Federal Highway Administration et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Short, David Short, Donald Short, Dave Short, Don Short, Sandy Short and Sarah Sarbacker
Defendant: United States Forest Service, Lee Potter, Federal Highway Administration, William P. O'Donnell and Shannon Boem
Petitioner: Billings County, North Dakota
Case Number: 1:2019cv00285
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Sarah Sarbacker, David Short, Donald Short, Sandra Short. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JJ England, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of JJ England -- Final Environmental Impact Statement and Record of Decision (FEIS/ROD))(England, JJ) Modified on 2/20/2020 to remove exhibit language (am).
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Shannon Boem, Federal Highway Administration, William P. O'Donnell, Lee Potter, United States Forest Service. (Wall, Sarah)
February 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Shannon Boem answer due 4/25/2020; William P. O'Donnell answer due 4/25/2020; Lee Potter answer due 4/25/2020. (rh)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Federal Highway Administration answer due by 4/25/2020; United States Forest Service answer due by 4/25/2020. (BG)
February 10, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Clerk's Office added link. (cjs)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Shannon Boem, Federal Highway Administration, William P. O'Donnell, Lee Potter. (Wall, Sarah) Modified on 2/10/2020 to add link (cjs).
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Billings County, North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer)(rh)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene by Billings County, North Dakota. (rh)
January 6, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Summons Returned Executed. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA at #4 . (js)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Shannon Boem served on 12/30/2019, answer due 3/3/2020; Federal Highway Administration served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; William P. O'Donnell served on 12/30/2019, answer due 3/3/2020; Lee Potter served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; United States Forest Service served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Tracking ID: 70180680000176122825, #2 Tracking ID: 70180680000176122801, #3 Tracking ID: 70180680000176122818, #4 Tracking ID: 70180680000176122849)(js)
January 2, 2020 Answer Deadlines Terminated. (js)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Sarbacker, Donald Short, Sandra Short, David Short. All Defendants (England, JJ) Modified on 1/6/2020 to restrict access. (js)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shannon Boem, Federal Highway Administration, William P. O'Donnell, Lee Potter, United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cjs)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shannon Boem, Federal Highway Administration, William P. O'Donnell, Lee Potter, United States Forest Service (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000288) filed by Sarah Sarbacker, Donald Short, Sandra Short, David Short. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short et al v. Federal Highway Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Short
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: JJ William England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Short
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: JJ William England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Short
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: JJ William England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Short
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: JJ William England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Short
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: JJ William England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Short
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: JJ William England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Sarbacker
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: JJ William England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Represented By: James P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Potter
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Represented By: James P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Represented By: James P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. O'Donnell
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Represented By: James P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Boem
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Represented By: James P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billings County, North Dakota
Represented By: Robert Timothy McCrum
Represented By: Elizabeth Dawson
Represented By: H. Patrick Weir, Sr.
Represented By: Bennett L. Johnson
Represented By: Tami Norgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?