Payne et al v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frank Payne and Lori Payne
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00050
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (5 days) (JS)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 3/21/2021. Discovery Motions due by 3/21/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/4/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 2/3/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 3/21/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 9/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 1/4/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 5/21/2021. Threshold Motions due by 7/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2021. (JS) (Main Document 18 replaced on 5/21/2020 to add Judge's Order. Regenerated NEF.) (rh).
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 5/21/2020. (JS)
May 19, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #16 STIPULATION. Filed in error. Clerk's office restricted access to document. Proposed orders should not be filed. Pursuant to Administrative Policy section XII(B) and XXI(B), proposed documents/orders, when requested by the Court, should be emailed to the appropriate chambers email address in either Word or Word Perfect format. (am)
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* STIPULATION Scheduling/Discovery Plan by Frank Payne. (Hoy, James) Modified on 5/19/2020 to restrict access (am).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as the presiding judge.(rh) Modified on 5/6/2020 to clarify roles of judges. NEF regenerated (am).
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Continental Resources, Inc. (rh)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven J. Adams. (rh)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven J. Adams (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1946968) by Continental Resources, Inc. (Adams, Steven) Modified on 4/28/2020 to add receipt number. (rh).
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Continental Resources, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/5/2020. (js)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Continental Resources, Inc..(Pittman, Ryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A. Pittman on behalf of Continental Resources, Inc. (Pittman, Ryan)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Lori Payne. (cjs)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Frank Payne. (cjs)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Payne, Lori Payne. Continental Resources, Inc. served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020 (Hoy, James)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lori Payne. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/10/2020. (rh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Frank Payne. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/10/2020. (rh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Continental Resources, Inc. (rh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Continental Resources, Inc. filed by Frank Payne, Lori Payne ($400 filing fee, Receipt #12000581). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) Modified on 4/3/2020 to add receipt number (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne et al v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Adams
Represented By: Ryan A. Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Payne
Represented By: James R Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Payne
Represented By: James R Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?