Sligar v. DCT Energy Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shane Sligar
Defendant: DCT Energy Services, LLC and Petro Harvester Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00058
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Petro Harvester Operating Company, LLC.(Waller, Michael)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by DCT Energy Services, LLC.(Vendsel, Jason)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Vendsel on behalf of DCT Energy Services, LLC (Vendsel, Jason)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane Sligar. Petro Harvester Operating Company, LLC served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020 (Larson, Mark)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane Sligar. DCT Energy Services, LLC served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020 (Larson, Mark)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DCT Energy Services, LLC, Petro Harvester Operating Company, LLC. (am)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DCT Energy Services, LLC, Petro Harvester Operating Company, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000630) filed by Shane Sligar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am) Modified on 4/16/2020 to add receipt number (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sligar v. DCT Energy Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCT Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Harvester Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Sligar
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?