Brown et al v. Weatherford U.S., L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Brown
Defendant: Daniel Licciardi, G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., Weatherford U.S., L.P. and Joseph Houle
Case Number: 1:2020cv00061
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., Joseph Houle.(Sweeney, Scott)
May 14, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Weatherford U.S., L.P..(Blazer, Brenda)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (am)
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Gregory Brown. (am)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. and Joseph Houle shall have until 5/29/2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., Joseph Houle. (Sweeney, Scott)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Weatherford U.S., L.P.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/26/2020. (cjs)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gregory Brown. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/18/2020. (cjs)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Briana L. Rummel on behalf of Weatherford U.S., L.P. (Rummel, Briana)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda Lynn Blazer on behalf of Weatherford U.S., L.P. (Blazer, Brenda)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Brown. Daniel Licciardi served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020 (Larson, Mark)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Brown. Joseph Houle served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020 (Larson, Mark)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Brown. Weatherford U.S., L.P. served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020 (Larson, Mark)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Brown. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020 (Larson, Mark) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/27/2020 to correct overlapping filing headers) (cjs). Regenerated on 4/27/2020 (cjs).
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gregory Brown. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/6/2020. (rh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., Joseph Houle, Daniel Licciardi, Weatherford U.S., L.P.. (rh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., Joseph Houle, Daniel Licciardi, Weatherford U.S., L.P. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000633) filed by Gregory Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) Modified on 4/23/2020 to add receipt number. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Weatherford U.S., L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Licciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford U.S., L.P.
Represented By: Brenda Lynn Blazer
Represented By: Briana L. Rummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Houle
Represented By: Scott D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Brown
Represented By: Anders Larson
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?